U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00807
  • Case Name: Freeman v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [Docket]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
  • August 30, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • August 30, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • August 08, 2022: [Reply]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 04, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 03, 2022: [Docket]
  • August 03, 2022: [Sealed Exhibit]
  • August 03, 2022: [Sealed Response]
  • August 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • August 02, 2022: [Seal]
  • August 01, 2022: [Supplement]
  • August 01, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 21, 2022: [Objections]
  • June 06, 2022: [Objections]
  • June 06, 2022: [Witness List]
  • June 06, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • June 03, 2022: [Exclude]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 02, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 01, 2022: [Exclude]
  • June 01, 2022: [Partial Summary Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 31, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 20, 2022: [Witness List]
  • May 20, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • May 20, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 05, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • May 05, 2022: [Witness List]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 19, 2021: [Protective Order]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order]
  • September 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 27, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • September 27, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Address Change]
  • September 07, 2021: [Docket]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • August 17, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 17, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 17, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 17, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.