U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00803
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Amazon.com Services LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 04, 2021: [Administrative Closing Order]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order]
  • September 24, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • September 24, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 01, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Docket]
  • August 27, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 20, 2021: [Notice from the Court]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 19, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order]
  • August 17, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 17, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • August 17, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 17, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.