U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00810
  • Case Name: Shakur v. Department of the Air Force et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order]
  • January 21, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Receipt]
  • August 17, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.