U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00804
  • Case Name: Miller v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Response to Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • May 20, 2022: [Remand to Agency]
  • May 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • December 16, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • December 14, 2021: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • November 30, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 05, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 05, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 17, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 17, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.