U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00814
  • Case Name: Miller v. Merit STM et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • August 01, 2022: [Docket]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 19, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • July 01, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 30, 2022: [Objections]
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • May 20, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • May 16, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 21, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 15, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Notice of Address Change]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 14, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Docket]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice of Address Change]
  • August 20, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 18, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 18, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 18, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 18, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.