U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00805
  • Case Name: Oklahoma State of et al v. United States Department of Interior et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 10, 2023: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 09, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 28, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 16, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 13, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 08, 2022: [Supplement]
  • June 08, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 17, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order]
  • March 09, 2022: [Docket]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 24, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • January 10, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 10, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 12, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 04, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • November 04, 2021: [Counterclaim]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 18, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • September 22, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 15, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 14, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 03, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 26, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • August 25, 2021: [Consolidate Cases]
  • August 24, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to Non-party]
  • August 24, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order]
  • August 20, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 18, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 18, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 18, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.