U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00816
  • Case Name: Monckton v. Nunn
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • November 04, 2021: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
  • October 13, 2021: [Response to Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order for Response]
  • September 27, 2021: [Brief]
  • September 27, 2021: [Dismiss]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order for Response]
  • August 24, 2021: [Receipt]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 19, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • August 19, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • August 19, 2021: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.