U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00815
  • Case Name: Edwards v. Oklahoma City Police Department et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 28, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Order]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 24, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 19, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 12, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 19, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • August 19, 2021: [Notice of Address Change]
  • August 19, 2021: [Complaint]
  • August 19, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.