U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00817
  • Case Name: Moyer v. Thomas et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 02, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • February 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 20, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 19, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 19, 2022: [Strike]
  • January 19, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • January 06, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 04, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • January 03, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 03, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • January 03, 2022: [Leave]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • December 22, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 08, 2021: [Certificate]
  • December 08, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • December 08, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 06, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 01, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Summons Issued]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice of Address Change]
  • September 13, 2021: [Letter]
  • September 03, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • September 03, 2021: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • September 03, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • August 20, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 20, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.