U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00820
  • Case Name: Schuman v. Reddy Ice Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [ADR Report by Mediator / Evaluator]
  • May 10, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • March 16, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • March 16, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [Protective Order]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice of Address Change]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 06, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order]
  • October 01, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • September 14, 2021: [Docket]
  • September 02, 2021: [Jury Demand]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • August 20, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 20, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 20, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 20, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.