U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00821
  • Case Name: Bennett et al v. Allstate Life Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • August 30, 2022: [ADR Report by Mediator / Evaluator]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 16, 2022: [Docket]
  • August 11, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 28, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Guardian/Attorney ad Litem]
  • July 20, 2022: [Objections]
  • July 20, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • July 20, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • July 18, 2022: [Objections]
  • July 18, 2022: [Reply]
  • July 15, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • July 15, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 15, 2022: [Leave]
  • July 15, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • July 15, 2022: [Objections]
  • July 08, 2022: [Trial Brief]
  • July 08, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • July 08, 2022: [In Limine]
  • July 08, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • July 08, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • July 08, 2022: [Designation of Deposition Testimony]
  • July 08, 2022: [Final Pretrial Report]
  • July 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 28, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • June 27, 2022: [Appoint Guardian/Attorney ad Litem]
  • June 22, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 10, 2022: [Objections]
  • June 03, 2022: [Objections]
  • June 01, 2022: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • June 01, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • May 27, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 20, 2022: [Exhibit List]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • April 15, 2022: [Hearing]
  • April 15, 2022: [Substitute Party]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order]
  • April 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 12, 2022: [Leave]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Guardian/Attorney ad Litem]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • April 01, 2022: [Leave]
  • April 01, 2022: [Appoint Guardian/Attorney ad Litem]
  • April 01, 2022: [Substitute Party]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • March 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • March 17, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • March 17, 2022: [Witness List]
  • March 01, 2022: [Witness List]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 22, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 21, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 21, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • October 18, 2021: [Suggestion of Death]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Docket]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 27, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • August 23, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 23, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 20, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 20, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.