U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00822
  • Case Name: Smith v. Grant
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • October 15, 2021: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 27, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice of Address Change]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Receipt]
  • August 30, 2021: [Letter]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 20, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • August 20, 2021: [Notice of Address Change]
  • August 20, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.