U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00813
  • Case Name: Miller v. Cook Group Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 20, 2021: [Conditional Transfer Order]
  • December 14, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order]
  • December 01, 2021: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Order to Show Cause]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Order]
  • August 23, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 20, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 20, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.