U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00823
  • Case Name: Mackey v. SAIA Motor Freight Line LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 07, 2022: [Compel]
  • July 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 01, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • March 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 22, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 19, 2021: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 11, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice of Subpoena]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • September 08, 2021: [Withdraw]
  • September 08, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • September 08, 2021: [Remand]
  • September 01, 2021: [Docket]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • August 23, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 20, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • August 20, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 20, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 20, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.