U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00827
  • Case Name: Draper v. Martin et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 28, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order]
  • September 23, 2021: [Receipt]
  • September 15, 2021: [Letter]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 23, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • August 23, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 23, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.