U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00831
  • Case Name: Taylor v. Wal-Mart Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 02, 2021: [Docket]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • August 26, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 24, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 24, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 24, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • August 23, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.