U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00825
  • Case Name: Cisneros v. Gomez et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 23, 2022: [Extension of Time]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 19, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Response to Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Brief]
  • May 26, 2022: [Strike]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 06, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 06, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 06, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 06, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Special Report]
  • March 21, 2022: [Exhibit]
  • March 18, 2022: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order]
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • March 17, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • March 17, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 14, 2022: [Letter]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • January 26, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 26, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 01, 2021: [Letter]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Receipt]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [Receipt]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 23, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • August 23, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 23, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.