U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00837
  • Case Name: Matthews v. LVNV Funding LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 25, 2021: [Joint Status Report]
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 20, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 19, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Docket]
  • September 21, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 17, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 17, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 16, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 16, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 24, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 24, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.