U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00836
  • Case Name: Moore et al v. Amazon.Com Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Reply]
  • September 01, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 14, 2022: [Default Judgment]
  • July 05, 2022: [Discovery]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 01, 2022: [Protective Order]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order]
  • June 29, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • June 29, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • June 27, 2022: [Declaration]
  • June 27, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • June 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 27, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • June 27, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • June 23, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order]
  • June 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 10, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Docket]
  • May 13, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 09, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 07, 2022: [Leave]
  • February 04, 2022: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 03, 2021: [Extension of Time]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 17, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 16, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 16, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • November 10, 2021: [Leave]
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice of Pending Motions]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 18, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 01, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • September 15, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • September 13, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 07, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 03, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 30, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 30, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • August 30, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • August 30, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order of Recusal]
  • August 24, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 24, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.