U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00818
  • Case Name: Bradshaw v. Crow
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
  • September 29, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 08, 2021: [Receipt]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order]
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 24, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • August 24, 2021: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.