U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00832
  • Case Name: Treadwell v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 21, 2022: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • March 17, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • March 14, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Substitute Party]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • December 22, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • December 20, 2021: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • December 20, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • December 20, 2021: [Remand to Agency]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to Non-party]
  • October 01, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • October 01, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to Non-party]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 16, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 08, 2021: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Order]
  • August 24, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 24, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.