U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00834
  • Case Name: Rigsby v. Smith et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [USCA - Mandate Issued]
  • February 08, 2022: [USCA Order]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 15, 2021: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • September 17, 2021: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order of Recusal]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order]
  • September 02, 2021: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • August 27, 2021: [Letter]
  • August 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 27, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
  • August 25, 2021: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 25, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • August 25, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 25, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.