U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00840
  • Case Name: Taylor v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 20, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • January 19, 2022: [Dismiss]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • December 07, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • December 07, 2021: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order]
  • December 07, 2021: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • December 07, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 16, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 26, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 25, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 25, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.