U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00842
  • Case Name: Harding v. Oklahoma Department of Corrections et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order]
  • January 25, 2022: [Reply]
  • January 20, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • January 19, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 14, 2022: [Reply]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Summons Reissued - Alias]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 22, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Address Change]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order]
  • December 01, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 04, 2021: [Objections]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order]
  • October 26, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • October 26, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 26, 2021: [Sealed Ex Parte Document]
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice from the Court]
  • October 26, 2021: [Special Report]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • October 21, 2021: [Leave]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Order]
  • August 26, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 26, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 25, 2021: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 25, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • August 25, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.