U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00843
  • Case Name: Mireles et al v. Liberty Insurance Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Compel]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • January 17, 2023: [Compel]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 17, 2023: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 17, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 17, 2023: [Transcript]
  • January 13, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 11, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 29, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • December 19, 2022: [Surreply]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 16, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • December 06, 2022: [Sealed Exhibit]
  • December 06, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 06, 2022: [Docket]
  • December 05, 2022: [Response to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • November 24, 2022: [Hearing]
  • November 24, 2022: [Sealed Exhibit]
  • November 24, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • November 23, 2022: [Leave]
  • November 22, 2022: [Supplement]
  • November 22, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 07, 2022: [Objections]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • November 01, 2022: [Sealed Exhibit]
  • November 01, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 01, 2022: [Exclude]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Objections]
  • October 24, 2022: [Witness List]
  • October 24, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • October 21, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 22, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 19, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • August 10, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • August 10, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2022: [Extension of Time]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • March 25, 2022: [Protective Order]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • October 06, 2021: [Docket]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Address Change]
  • September 15, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 01, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 01, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice from the Court]
  • August 26, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • August 26, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.