U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00841
  • Case Name: Growtech Industries LLC v. Mary Mechanix LLP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
January, 2023
  • January 01, 2023: [Notice of Address Change]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • November 21, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • November 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 11, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 07, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 03, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 25, 2022: [Docket]
  • October 20, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 10, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 10, 2022: [Extension of Time]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Reply]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 26, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 20, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 13, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 12, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 08, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 06, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 02, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 18, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 09, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 09, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order of Recusal]
  • November 04, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • November 04, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 03, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 08, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Order]
  • September 10, 2021: [Summons Issued]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 26, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 26, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 26, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.