U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00826
  • Case Name: Wonsch v. Oklahoma State of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • December 21, 2022: [Objections]
  • December 13, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 07, 2022: [Stay Case]
  • December 02, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [USCA - Mandate Issued]
  • December 01, 2022: [USCA Order]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [USCA Order]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Certiorari - Granted or Denied - Supreme Court]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Certiorari - Supreme Court]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 09, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 08, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • March 08, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • February 11, 2022: [Objections]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Objections]
  • November 10, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • November 03, 2021: [Brief]
  • November 03, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • November 02, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • November 02, 2021: [Consent-Do Not Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • October 13, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 07, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order for Response]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Receipt]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Letter]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order]
  • August 26, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • August 26, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.