U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00845
  • Case Name: Concept Ventures LLC v. Navigators Specialty Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [~Notice (other)]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 06, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • April 15, 2022: [Leave]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 04, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 01, 2021: [Leave]
  • October 01, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Address Change]
  • September 16, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order]
  • September 02, 2021: [Docket]
  • September 02, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 27, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 27, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 27, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.