U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00846
  • Case Name: Sabus v. Pawnee County Board of County Commissioners et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Transcript Letter]
  • June 24, 2022: [Transcript Order Form]
  • June 13, 2022: [USCA Appeal Fee]
  • June 10, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 10, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • June 09, 2022: [Amended Notice of Appeal]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order]
  • April 25, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Objections]
  • February 07, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • February 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 12, 2022: [Leave]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • January 10, 2022: [Strike]
  • January 10, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 06, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Reply]
  • December 21, 2021: [Objections]
  • December 06, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • December 06, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 02, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 02, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Objections]
  • October 22, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • October 22, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 05, 2021: [Summons Issued]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 30, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 27, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.