U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00855
  • Case Name: Brown v. Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • October 12, 2022: [Docket]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • October 12, 2021: [Docket]
  • October 12, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • September 23, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • September 23, 2021: [Leave]
  • September 23, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 23, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2021
  • August 28, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 27, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 27, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.