U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00853
  • Case Name: Henderson v. Farmers Insurance Company Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Transfer Case]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 12, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 18, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • September 23, 2021: [Stay Case]
  • September 09, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 03, 2021: [Transfer Case]
  • September 03, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 03, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • September 03, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 27, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.