U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00856
  • Case Name: Beaulieu v. Avante USA LTD et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order]
  • January 17, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • January 04, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order to Show Cause]
  • December 06, 2021: [Docket]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order]
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
  • November 03, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 14, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 22, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 22, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2021
  • August 28, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 27, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 27, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.