U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00854
  • Case Name: Bratcher v. Enhanced Recovery Company LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 24, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 08, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 04, 2021: [Docket]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • September 23, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 23, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2021
  • August 28, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 27, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 27, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.