U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00851
  • Case Name: Pittman v. LNU
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 28, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 27, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • August 27, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.