U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00850
  • Case Name: Miller v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Reply]
  • September 13, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 06, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Strike]
  • August 23, 2022: [Entry of Default]
  • August 15, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • August 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 20, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 23, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 20, 2021: [Notice from the Court]
  • September 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 07, 2021: [Summons Issued]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 27, 2021: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • August 27, 2021: [Receipt]
  • August 27, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.