U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00860
  • Case Name: McCoy et al v. Stryker Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 11, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 01, 2021: [Reply]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice from the Court]
  • September 27, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • September 27, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 24, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • September 09, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 03, 2021: [Dismiss]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • August 31, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • August 31, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 31, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.