U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00861
  • Case Name: Warren v. Affiliated Management Services Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 30, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order]
  • March 23, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 24, 2022: [Docket]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 04, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • February 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order]
  • February 04, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • February 02, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Notice from the Court]
  • December 28, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order to Show Cause]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 31, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.