U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00862
  • Case Name: Shilling v. Walmart Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [Exhibit List]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Protective Order]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 20, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • October 08, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Docket]
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • September 01, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 31, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • August 31, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 31, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.