U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00848
  • Case Name: Bowersock v. Oklahoma Department of Corrections et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • January 04, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • January 04, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Mail Returned]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Mail Returned]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order]
  • September 24, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 31, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • August 31, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 31, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.