U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00865
  • Case Name: Waters et al v. City of Altus, Oklahoma et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Reply]
  • December 10, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 03, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • November 15, 2021: [Exhibit]
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • November 12, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 09, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 04, 2021: [Withdraw]
  • November 02, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 21, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 06, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 01, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • October 01, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 27, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 24, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 24, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 15, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 01, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 01, 2021: [Summons Issued]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 31, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 31, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.