U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00859
  • Case Name: Oklahoma State Conference of the NAACP v. O'Connor et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [USCA - Mandate Issued]
  • September 08, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [USCA Order]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 21, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Transcript Letter]
  • December 16, 2021: [Transcript Order Form]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order Staying Case]
  • November 30, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 29, 2021: [Stay Case]
  • November 24, 2021: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • November 24, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 12, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Docket]
  • October 27, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 27, 2021: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • October 27, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 12, 2021: [Reply]
  • October 08, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 05, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 05, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 05, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 05, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • October 05, 2021: [Return of Service - NON SUMMONS]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 14, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • September 13, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 07, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 01, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 01, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • September 01, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 01, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.