U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00849
  • Case Name: Pinkard v. Department of Corrections et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • December 15, 2021: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • December 01, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Receipt]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 02, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • September 02, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.