U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00867
  • Case Name: Mack v. Hutchinson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • December 17, 2021: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order]
  • November 01, 2021: [Mail Returned]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice of Address Change]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order Vacating Report and Recommendation]
  • September 23, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
  • September 22, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 03, 2021: [Letter]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 03, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • September 03, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 03, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.