U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00869
  • Case Name: Parker v. Crow
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Alter Judgment]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • September 07, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
  • September 03, 2021: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • September 03, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • September 03, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 03, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.