U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00870
  • Case Name: Wells v. Great West Casualty Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • October 17, 2022: [Objections]
  • October 03, 2022: [Exclude]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Witness List]
  • September 27, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • September 16, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • September 16, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • March 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • January 28, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • January 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • January 13, 2022: [Docket]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Order]
  • December 03, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 02, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 16, 2021: [Extension of Time]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • October 26, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 18, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 04, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order]
  • October 01, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • October 01, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • September 30, 2021: [Substitute Party]
  • September 09, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • September 08, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 03, 2021: [Suggestion of Death]
  • September 03, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 03, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.