U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00871
  • Case Name: Flaherty v. Office of Juvenile Affairs et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • June 09, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 03, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • May 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 19, 2022: [Extension of Time]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 06, 2022: [Response to Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Hearing]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 19, 2022: [Extension of Time]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 22, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • October 21, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 07, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 23, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 23, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 23, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • September 23, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 15, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 13, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 13, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 10, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 08, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • September 08, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 07, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 03, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 03, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.