U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00873
  • Case Name: Cordis v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 14, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • November 14, 2022: [Objections]
  • November 10, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 07, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 04, 2022: [Objections]
  • November 02, 2022: [Counter Designation of Deposition Testimony]
  • November 02, 2022: [Objections]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [In Limine]
  • October 28, 2022: [Designation of Deposition Testimony]
  • October 28, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 28, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • October 28, 2022: [Final Pretrial Report]
  • October 28, 2022: [Trial Brief]
  • October 27, 2022: [In Limine]
  • October 26, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order]
  • October 26, 2022: [Designation of Deposition Testimony]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order]
  • June 06, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 02, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Reply]
  • May 25, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 24, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 23, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 12, 2022: [Compel]
  • May 11, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 04, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 04, 2022: [Exclude]
  • May 04, 2022: [Strike]
  • May 02, 2022: [Objections]
  • May 02, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • May 02, 2022: [Affidavit of Service - NON SUMMONS]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • April 27, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [Compel]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • April 18, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • April 18, 2022: [Witness List]
  • April 15, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • April 14, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • March 18, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 14, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • October 25, 2021: [Certification of Issue to State Court]
  • October 22, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order]
  • October 15, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 06, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Docket]
  • September 24, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 13, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 08, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 07, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 07, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 07, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 07, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.