U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00876
  • Case Name: Edmond Regional Eye Assoicates Inc v. Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • January 16, 2023: [Notice of Settlement]
  • January 13, 2023: [Docket]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
  • January 04, 2023: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 03, 2023: [In Limine]
  • January 03, 2023: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • January 03, 2023: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 03, 2023: [Final Pretrial Report]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Reply]
  • December 19, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Sealed Exhibit]
  • November 28, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Objections]
  • October 03, 2022: [Objections]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • September 27, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • September 26, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • September 19, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • September 15, 2022: [Witness List]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • September 06, 2022: [Witness List]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order]
  • August 31, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • August 31, 2022: [Protective Order]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 02, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 01, 2022: [Witness List]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 20, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Docket]
  • September 10, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 10, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 07, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 07, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • September 07, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 07, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.