U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00880
  • Case Name: Caperton v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 29, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • April 14, 2022: [Social Security Reply Brief]
  • April 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 05, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 17, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
  • January 12, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • December 14, 2021: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • November 23, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 13, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 07, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 07, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.