U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00879
  • Case Name: Monster Technology Group LLC v. Eller
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 23, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 22, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 16, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 05, 2022: [Extension of Time]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 18, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • October 31, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • October 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [USCA - Mandate Issued]
  • August 01, 2022: [USCA Order and Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Transcript Letter]
  • December 03, 2021: [Receipt]
  • December 03, 2021: [Transcript Order Form]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 16, 2021: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 13, 2021: [Reconsideration]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order]
  • September 09, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • September 09, 2021: [Receipt]
  • September 08, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 08, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.